Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Miceli

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1698Born
1 Feb 173334.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Oct 175153.5SelectedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
24 Jan 175253.8ConfirmedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
30 Jan 175253.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
15 Jun 176365.2DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Miceli
Bishop Giovanni Battista Miceli (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLongobardi

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,763
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 152
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,752, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast