Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gherardo Antonio Volpe

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1692Born
15 Jun 171522.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 174452.4AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
21 Dec 174452.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
28 Jan 176875.5DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

MicroData Summary
Gherardo Antonio Volpe
Bishop Gherardo Antonio Volpe
(born , died )
Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant’Agata

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1766
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025