Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Carlo Cardinal Bandi

Deceased

Bishop of Imola, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1709Born
18 Sep 173425.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 174435.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
18 Dec 174435.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
28 Dec 174435.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
20 Mar 175242.6AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
29 May 177565.8Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
11 Sep 177566.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 177566.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
23 Mar 178474.6DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary
Giovanni Carlo Bandi
Giovanni Carlo Cardinal Bandi
(born , died )
Bishop of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena, Diocese of Cesena

Relatives
  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
  • a cardinal for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 May 1775
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025