Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Sardi

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1715³BornSulmona
28 Mar 173924.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 175136.4AppointedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
11 Jul 175136.4Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
25 Sep 178671.6DiedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Sardi:
Bishop Giacinto Sardi (born , died ) Bishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015