Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vito Antonio Mastandrea

Deceased

Bishop of Vico Equense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1709BornGiovenazzo
10 Aug 173222.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 175142.2AppointedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
21 Nov 175142.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
13 Feb 177363.4DiedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vito Antonio Mastandrea:
Bishop Vito Antonio Mastandrea (born , died ) Bishop of Vico Equense

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 440
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015