Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nunzio Baccari

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1667³BornCapracotta
15 Apr 1693¹25.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 171850.7AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
19 Mar 171850.7Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
10 Jan 173870.5DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nunzio Baccari:
Bishop Nunzio Baccari (born , died ) Bishop of Boiano

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1734
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015