Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Tansj (Tansi)

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1668³BornMatera
22 Dec 169628.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 172152.7AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
25 Jul 172152.7Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
18 Jul 172354.7DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Tansj (Tansi):
Bishop Francesco Maria Tansj (Tansi) (born , died ) Bishop of Teramo

  • a priest for 26.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015