Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onofrio Elisei

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1668Born
4 Nov 170335.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Nov 170335.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 170537.3AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
21 Jun 1705³37.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
10 Sep 172153.6AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
27 Nov 173365.8DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Onofrio Elisei (VIAF: 88912220)
Bishop Onofrio Elisei (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoligno, Diocese of Foligno
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceOrvieto, Diocese of Orvieto
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Orvieto, Diocese of Orvieto

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 112, and Page 398
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 20
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 28 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Aug 2021

Quantcast