Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato Palumbo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1675BornMartano
19 Oct 169823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
30 Sep 173055.4SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
18 Dec 173055.6ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
21 Dec 173055.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
19 Jul 175378.2DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Palumbo:
Bishop Fortunato Palumbo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Trivento

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 417
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015