Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Marculli

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1695Born
16 Mar 172024.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Mar 172024.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 173338.0AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
8 Dec 173338.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
25 May 175963.5DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Michael Marculli
Bishop Michael Marculli (born , died ) Bishop of Lucera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGravina

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018