Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Celestino Galiano, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1681BornSan Giovanni Rotondo
20 Dec 170423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
31 Mar 173149.4SelectedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
30 Apr 173149.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
27 May 173149.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
31 Mar 173250.4ResignedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
31 Mar 173250.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
26 Jul 175371.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Celestino Galiano:
Archbishop Celestino Galiano O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 392, and Page 404
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015