Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre François de Sales de Thorens

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1704BornThorens
20 Sep 172723.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 174136.8SelectedBishop of Aosta, Italy
17 Apr 174137.0ConfirmedBishop of Aosta, Italy
23 Apr 174137.0Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
5 Dec 178379.6DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pierre François de Sales de Thorens:
Bishop Pierre François de Sales de Thorens (born , died ) Bishop of Aosta

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 106
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015