Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Felice Sanmartino

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1679BornCastelnuovo
2 Jun 170829.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 174162.1SelectedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
17 Apr 174162.2ConfirmedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
25 Apr 174162.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
27 Aug 175374.6DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Felice Sanmartino:
Bishop Carlo Felice Sanmartino (born , died ) Bishop of Mondovi

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 296
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015