Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Vittorio Villa

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1685Born
5 Aug 171428.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 174155.4SelectedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
17 Apr 174155.5ConfirmedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
25 Apr 174155.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
16 Oct 176378.0DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Vittorio Villa
Bishop Michele Vittorio Villa (born , died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 245
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018