Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Antonio della Gatta

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1675³BornBitonto
29 Jun 172247.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Jul 172247.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 172247.4AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
19 Jul 172247.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bitonto, Italy
8 Jul 173762.4AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
25 Sep 174772.6DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luca Antonio della Gatta:
Bishop Luca Antonio della Gatta (born , died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1739
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 121
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015