Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Iovone

Deceased

Bishop of Alife, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1669Born
14 Mar 169929.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Apr 169929.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 173061.1AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
21 Dec 173061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
31 Oct 173364.0DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Iovone
Bishop Gaetano Iovone (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFelitto

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018