Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Agostino Scorza (Scortia)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1676Born
19 Dec 169923.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Sep 170024.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 172447.9AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
24 Jun 172447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
9 Apr 173154.7AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
17 Feb 174871.5ResignedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Agostino Scorza (Scortia)
Archbishop Pietro Agostino Scorza (Scortia) (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorre Maggiore

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 91
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018