Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccolò de Rofa (Rosa)

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1693BornNapoli
18 Dec 171724.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 173340.0AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
8 Dec 173340.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
Jan 177480.1DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccolò de Rofa (Rosa):
Bishop Niccolò de Rofa (Rosa) (born ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013