Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Morelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Strongoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1714Born
1 Jan 174328.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 174833.8AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
4 Feb 174833.8Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
2 Oct 179278.5ResignedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
17 May 180490.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Strongoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Morelli
Bishop Domenico Morelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Strongoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCutro

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 56.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018