Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Ciocchi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valva e Sulmona

Titular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1711BornVico
6 Feb 173523.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 175240.2AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
30 Jan 175240.2Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
10 Sep 176250.8ResignedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
20 Dec 176251.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia

MicroData Summary for Carlo Ciocchi:
Archbishop Carlo Ciocchi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Valva e Sulmona

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 402, and Page 431
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015