Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Mornati

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1704BornMacerata
11 Jun 172925.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 175450.5AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
29 Sep 175450.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
8 Jun 177874.3DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Mornati:
Bishop Filippo Mornati (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015