Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Giovanni Prosperi

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1705BornCamerino
16 Apr 172924.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 176660.9AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
9 Feb 176661.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
1 Dec 179186.8DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Giovanni Prosperi:
Bishop Domenico Giovanni Prosperi (born , died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1788
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013