Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Pucilli

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1716BornTolfa
19 Dec 173923.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 177558.6AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
24 Jun 177558.7Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
7 Apr 178669.5DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Pucilli:
Bishop Benedetto Pucilli (born , died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1775, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015