Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Giannini

Deceased

Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1685³Born
30 Jun 171328.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 173347.8AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
19 Apr 173347.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
Feb 1767³81.6DiedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Giannini
Bishop Agostino Giannini (born , died Feb 1767) Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColliano

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast