Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Michele Abati (Abbate)

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1678BornBarulen
18 Dec 170022.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Dec 170123.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 172445.7AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
2 Jul 172445.7Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
28 Sep 173355.0AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
6 May 174869.6DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Nicola Michele Abati (Abbate):
Bishop Nicola Michele Abati (Abbate) (born , died ) Bishop of Squillace

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 386
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015