Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Puoti

Deceased

Bishop of Marsico Nuovo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1678BornArezzo
17 Dec 170123.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 173253.9AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
12 Oct 173253.9Ordained BishopBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
3 Aug 174465.7DiedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Puoti:
Bishop Alessandro Puoti (born , died ) Bishop of Marsico Nuovo

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1742
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013