Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Gasparini

Deceased

Bishop of Città di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1676³Born
Aug 1706³30.1AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Venice, Italy
Dec 1706³30.4ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Venice, Italy
1707²30.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Venice, Italy
Nov 1710³34.3ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Venice, Italy
8 Dec 173357.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 173457.5AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
31 Jan 173457.6Ordained BishopBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
12 Sep 174973.2DiedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Gasparini
Bishop Ottavio Gasparini (born , died ) Bishop of Città di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMercatello

  • a priest for 15.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 167
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 3
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast