Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Dominique (Malachias) d’Inguimbert, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1683Born
24 Sep 170724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
17 Dec 173148.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
27 Dec 173148.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
25 May 173551.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Carpentras, France
6 Sep 175774.0DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Dominique (Malachias) d’Inguimbert
Archbishop Joseph-Dominique (Malachias) d’Inguimbert O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Carpentras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarpentras

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 149, and Page 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,731, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast