Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismondo Tudisi

Deceased

Bishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1692Born
2 Sep 173341.3AppointedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
6 Sep 173341.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
Jun 1760³68.0DiedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigismondo Tudisi
Bishop Sigismondo Tudisi (born , died Jun 1760) Bishop of Trebinje e Mrkan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast