Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Pugliesi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1718BornZaton Veliki
18 Dec 175234.3AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
1 Jul 175334.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
6 Apr 176748.6AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
Sep 1777³59.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
19 Sep 177759.1ResignedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
9 Jul 177859.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Pugliesi:
Archbishop Nicola Pugliesi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 310, and Page 351
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 404
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015