Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Budmani

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1700Born
23 Sep 172424.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 175251.6SelectedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
17 Jul 175251.8ConfirmedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
23 Jul 175251.8Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
2 Apr 177271.5DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Pietro Budmani
Bishop Pietro Budmani (born , died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018