Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Tomicich

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1710BornRagusa
9 Aug 173323.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 175343.1AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
7 Apr 175443.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
18 Sep 175848.1ResignedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Thomas Tomicich:
Archbishop Thomas Tomicich (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015