Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedetto Zuzzeri (Zuzeri)

Deceased

Archbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1715Born
29 Sep 174832.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Oct 174833.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 175438.2AppointedArchbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria
23 Jun 175438.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Zuzzeri (Zuzeri)
Archbishop Benedetto Zuzzeri (Zuzeri) (born ) Archbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 384
  • ob/c23: CB, 25 Oct 2015
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 25
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,623

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018