Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hijacint Marija Milković, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1689BornRagusa
15 Apr 171324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Jun 174556.1AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
11 Jul 174556.2Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
20 Mar 175262.9AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
21 Mar 175666.9DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Hijacint Marija Milković:
Archbishop Hijacint Marija Milković O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 351, and Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015