Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mattaeus Massarech

Deceased

Archbishop of Skopje


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1726¹BornSkopje
18 Dec 175832.9AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
27 Sep 175933.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
8 Dec 180882.9DiedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mattaeus Massarech:
Archbishop Mattaeus Massarech (born 1726, died ) Archbishop of Skopje

  • a bishop for 49.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 370
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015