Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marijan Bogdanović, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman)

Titular Bishop of Echinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1720BornKreševo
17 Aug 176746.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman), Croatia
17 Aug 176746.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
8 May 176847.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Echinus
7 Jan 177251.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Marijan Bogdanović:
Bishop Marijan Bogdanović O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman)

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 205, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016