Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Maria Beamonte, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1678Born
20 Jul 172849.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Oëa
1 Aug 172849.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oëa
11 May 173354.6AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
24 Jul 174263.8DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Maria Beamonte
Bishop Bernardo Maria Beamonte O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1741
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 110, and Page 295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast