Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Gioeni y d’Aragona

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1678BornPalermo
6 Jun 170628.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 173052.1SelectedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
11 Dec 173052.5ConfirmedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
17 Dec 173052.5Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
Oct 1754³76.3DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Gioeni y d’Aragona:
Bishop Lorenzo Gioeni y d’Aragona (born ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 23 Sep 2013