Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Magno, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1687³BornCuses
15 Mar 171023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
20 Sep 172841.6AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
21 Sep 172841.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
7 Sep 174558.5DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Magno:
Bishop Alessandro Magno O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1728, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015