Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Pinaque, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1670³Born
28 Jun 169625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
11 Nov 173060.2SelectedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
11 Dec 173060.3ConfirmedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
17 Dec 173060.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
13 Apr 173766.7DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Santiago Pinaque
Bishop Santiago Pinaque O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza, Spain

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 138
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio EspaŮol, Volume 1,700, Page 49, Number 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1730, Number 38
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast