Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Paolo Pandolfelli

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1689Born
28 Oct 172334.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 173344.1SelectedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
20 Jan 173444.9ConfirmedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
31 Jan 173445.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
19 Apr 176677.2DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Nicola Paolo Pandolfelli
Bishop Nicola Paolo Pandolfelli (born , died ) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018