Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Olivieri

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1680Born
28 Dec 171938.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 173150.1AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
11 Mar 173150.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
21 Aug 175877.6DiedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Olivieri
Bishop Camillo Olivieri (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCutri

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,752
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,731, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast