Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Salomone (Salamone)

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1677BornThermularum
6 Mar 170022.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Sep 173861.3AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
14 Sep 173861.4Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
May 174366.0DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Salomone (Salamone):
Bishop Francesco Antonio Salomone (Salamone) (born ) Bishop of Venosa

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013