Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea Schiano

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Lubrense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1676³BornClesa
18 Jun 170731.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 173862.2AppointedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
27 Jul 173862.2Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
12 Dec 174569.6DiedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Schiano:
Bishop Giovanni Andrea Schiano (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Lubrense

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 280
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015