Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paschalis Zaini

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1692Born
16 Apr 171926.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 173542.7AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
13 Mar 173542.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
15 Feb 175663.7DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Paschalis Zaini
Bishop Paschalis Zaini (born , died ) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,735, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast