Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Anelli

Deceased

Bishop of Andria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1698BornAndria
20 Dec 172123.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 173940.1AppointedBishop of Acerno, Italy
1 Feb 173940.1Ordained BishopBishop of Acerno, Italy
20 May 174344.4AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
14 Jul 175657.6DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Anelli:
Bishop Domenico Anelli (born , died ) Bishop of Andria

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 63, and Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013