Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Bacigalupi

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1675BornGenova
22 Feb 169823.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 173257.1AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
4 May 173257.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
15 Jul 174065.4DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Bacigalupi:
Bishop Antonio Maria Bacigalupi (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1736
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 437
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013