Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Domenico Albini

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1679³BornMuro
27 Feb 173657.1AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
19 Mar 173657.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
25 Jul 174465.5DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claudio Domenico Albini:
Bishop Claudio Domenico Albini (born , died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015