Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Łukasz Krzysztof Wielewiejski

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cambysopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1660³BornGradoliz
11 Sep 172665.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
29 Sep 172665.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
28 Jan 174382.2DiedTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Łukasz Krzysztof Wielewiejski:
Bishop Łukasz Krzysztof Wielewiejski (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Cambysopolis

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 138
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015