Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltazar Wilksycki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

Titular Bishop of Eucarpia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1658BornChleven
29 Apr 169032.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 172870.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
12 Apr 172870.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
10 Oct 172870.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
172971.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Baltazar Wilksycki:
Bishop Baltazar Wilksycki (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,452
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013